+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government