+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (18)
April 29, 2014: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - PI and reverse previous The motion passed on a vote of 5-2.
April 29, 2014: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion failed on a vote of 2-5.
April 24, 2014: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.053 (Attachment KK). The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
April 24, 2014: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.048 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2.
April 24, 2014: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.052 The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
April 24, 2014: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.049 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 24, 2014: Senate Health & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.051 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 11, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
April 11, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 1, 2014: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment B). The motion failed on a vote of 5-6.
April 1, 2014: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D). The motion failed on a vote of 5-6.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor