+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 20, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 15, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs