+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2014: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.004 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
April 7, 2014: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1295, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor