+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education