+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor