+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 14, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee of the Whole Amendment - Change from Passed to Lost
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 22, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 19, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary