+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-5.
April 16, 2013: House Public Health Care & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor