+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-0, with 1 excused.
April 16, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Reconsider House Bill 15-1290. The motion was withdrawn.
April 14, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B). The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor