+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor