+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor