+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor