+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor