+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2014: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C). The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
April 8, 2014: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
March 11, 2014: House Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor