+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On June 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor