+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development