+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor