+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor