+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1280 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor