+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance