+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 31, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Finance
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 25, 2014: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1278 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
April 22, 2014: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1278 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
April 14, 2014: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1278 to the Committee on Finance. The motion passed on a vote of 5-2.
April 4, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1278 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 11-1.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor