+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .HB16-1278
March 17, 2016: House Judiciary: . .HB16-1278
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor