+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
April 30, 2013: Senate Transportation: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1278 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 4-1.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-4.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 10, 2013: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Withdraw the motion for the conceptual amendment to prepared amendment L.005.
April 10, 2013: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor