+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy + Appropriations
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .HB15-1277
April 16, 2015: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .HB15-1277
April 2, 2015: House Appropriations: . .HB15-1277
March 23, 2015: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .HB15-1277
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor