+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor