+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor