+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development