+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 15, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 14, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 13, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs