+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 30, 2013: Senate Local Government: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
April 30, 2013: Senate Local Government: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 007 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
April 30, 2013: Senate Local Government: FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely HB 13-1273. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-4.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor