+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2014 - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations