+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1270
March 3, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1270
March 3, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1270
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor