+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1270 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 5-2.
April 15, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
April 15, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1270, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 6-3.
April 15, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
March 18, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
March 18, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1270, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 8-3.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor