+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over with Amendments to 05/08/2024 - Committee, Floor
On May 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over with Amendments to 05/07/2024 - Committee, Floor
On May 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over with Amendments to 05/04/2024 - Committee, Floor
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over with Amendments to 05/03/2024 - Committee, Floor
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over with Amendments to 05/02/2024 - Committee, Floor
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over with Amendments to 05/01/2024 - Committee, Floor
On April 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over with Amendments to 04/30/2024 - Committee, Floor
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 20, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 14, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor