+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor