+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
- Sent to the Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary