+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 26, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
April 22, 2013: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment D). The motion failed on a vote of 2-3.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor