+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (20)
May 5, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1261
May 3, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 27, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1261
April 27, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1261
April 27, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1261
April 15, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1261
April 15, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
April 6, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1261
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor