+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations