+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 29, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1259 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor