+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment + Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 24, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection.
April 24, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
April 22, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment L). The motion passed on a vote of 7-4.
April 22, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 7-4.
March 19, 2015: House Health, Insurance, & Environment: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor