+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 29, 2013: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 17, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 8-4.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor