+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services