+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2015 - No Amendments
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor