+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs