+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor