+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations