+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor