+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy