+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Votes (4)
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1252 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
April 16, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1252 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor