+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance + Education
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/16/2015 - No Amendments
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance